FL S0222 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on September 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

(THIS BILL COMBINED IN CS/214 & 222) Rejecting white nationalism and white supremacy as hateful, dangerous, and morally corrupt, and affirming that such philosophies are contradictory to the values that define the people of Florida, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

White Nationalism and White Supremacy

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2020-01-13SenateOriginal bill laid on Table, refer to combined CS/SR 214
2020-01-13SenateCS by Infrastructure and Security; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2020-01-13SenateCS combines this bill with SR 214
2020-01-06SenateOn Committee agenda-- Infrastructure and Security, 01/13/20, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Building --Fav/CS Combined
2019-09-19SenateReferred to Infrastructure and Security; Judiciary; Rules
2019-09-04SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H51 (Similar To) 2020-01-14 - Introduced
S214 (Similar To) 2020-01-16 - Now in Judiciary

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback