FL S0196 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 11 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-09 - Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on March 11 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-09 - Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Defining the terms "bona fide contract" and "qualified contract" for purposes of the Florida Housing Finance Corporation Act; deleting certain limitations and restrictions on, and requirements for, loans made by the corporation to sponsors of housing for the elderly under the State Apartment Incentive Loan Program; designating the corporation, rather than the State Board of Administration, as the state fiscal agency to make determinations in connection with specified bonds; providing construction relating to low-income tax credit developments if a qualified contract does not close for specified reasons, etc.
Title
Florida Housing Finance Corporation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-10 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#871 (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#848 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#22 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-11-03 - Senate - Senate Community Affairs (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#848 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#22 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-11-03 - Senate - Senate Community Affairs (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-09 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2022-03-10 | House | CS passed; YEAS 113, NAYS 0 |
2022-03-10 | House | Amendment 796083 Recede |
2022-03-10 | House | Added to Senate Message List |
2022-03-10 | House | In Messages |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Requested House to recede |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Refused to concur in 1 amendment(s) (796083) |
2022-03-10 | Senate | In returning messages |
2022-03-09 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 118, NAYS 0 |
2022-03-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-08 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2022-03-08 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2022-03-08 | House | Amendment 796083 adopted |
2022-03-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-07 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2022-03-07 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/8/2022) |
2022-03-07 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2022-03-03 | House | In Messages |
2022-03-03 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-02 | Senate | CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/03/22 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2022-02-28 | Senate | CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/28/22, 10:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 6 NAYS 4 |
2022-01-28 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 02/02/22, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-11-03 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development |
2021-11-03 | Senate | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2021-10-25 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 11/03/21, 8:30 am, 37 Senate Building |
2021-09-21 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations |
2021-09-14 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H137 (Similar To) 2022-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 196
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
420 | 503 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 5087 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 509 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 5092 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 5099 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 628 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |