FL S0184 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-22 - Chapter No. 2015-40
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing absent uniformed services voters and overseas voters to use the federal write-in absentee ballot in any state or local election; prohibiting the supervisor of elections from canvassing federal write-in absentee ballots from overseas voters in certain elections until 10 days after the date of the election; revising minimum requirements for Department of State rules used to determine what constitutes a valid vote on a federal write-in absentee ballot, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Federal Write-in Absentee Ballot

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#212 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#3 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-22 Chapter No. 2015-40
2015-05-21 Approved by Governor
2015-05-07 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2015-04-22SenateOrdered enrolled
2015-04-22HousePassed; YEAS 118 NAYS 0
2015-04-22HouseRead 3rd time
2015-04-21HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2015-04-21HouseRead 2nd time
2015-04-21HouseSubstituted for HB 109
2015-04-17HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/21/15
2015-04-17HouseReceived
2015-04-17HouseReferred to Calendar
2015-04-08HouseIn Messages
2015-04-02SenatePassed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
2015-04-02SenateRead 3rd time
2015-04-01SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2015-04-01SenateRead 2nd time
2015-03-26SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/01/15
2015-03-26SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2015-03-26SenateFavorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2015-03-23SenateOn Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 03/26/15, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2015-03-17SenateNow in Fiscal Policy
2015-03-17SenateFavorable by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2015-03-12SenateOn Committee agenda-- Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security, 03/17/15, 9:00 am, 37 Senate Office Building
2015-03-11SenateNow in Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security
2015-03-10SenateFavorable by Ethics and Elections; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2015-03-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Ethics and Elections, 03/10/15, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2015-03-03SenateIntroduced
2015-01-08SenateReferred to Ethics and Elections; Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Fiscal Policy
2014-12-12SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H0109 (Same As) 2015-04-21 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 184 (Ch. 2015-40)
H1161 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died in Government Operations Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 184 (Ch. 2015-40), CS/CS/SB 228 (Ch. 2015-36)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1016952Amended CodeSee Bill Text
102166Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback