FL S0162 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Redefining the term "sexual offender", etc.
Title
Sexual Offender Registration
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Criminal Justice |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Rules |
2020-12-04 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H193 (Same As) 2021-04-13 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 234 (Ch. 2021-156)
H41 (Similar To) 2021-01-29 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
S126 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Criminal Justice
S234 (Similar To) 2021-06-23 - Chapter No. 2021-156
H41 (Similar To) 2021-01-29 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
S126 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Criminal Justice
S234 (Similar To) 2021-06-23 - Chapter No. 2021-156
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/162 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/162/BillText/Filed/HTML |