FL S0134 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing the lifetime electronic monitoring program within the Department of Law Enforcement; requiring the implementation of an electronic monitoring system to monitor sex offenders sentenced to lifetime electronic monitoring; requiring a sex offender sentenced to lifetime electronic monitoring to wear or carry an electronic monitoring device as determined by the department; requiring a convicted sex offender to be sentenced to lifetime electronic monitoring; providing criminal penalties, etc.
Title
Lifetime Electronic Monitoring of Sex Offenders
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | Senate | Died in Criminal Justice |
2015-04-08 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 04/13/15, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building --Not Considered |
2015-04-02 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 04/07/15, 10:00 am, 37 Senate Office Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2014-12-12 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2014-11-18 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0203 (Same As) 2015-04-28 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
S1286 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
H1037 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died on Calendar
S1286 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
H1037 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died on Calendar
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
943 | 71 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 711 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |