FL H0203 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes lifetime electronic monitoring program within FDLE; requires electronic monitoring system to monitor sex offenders sentenced to lifetime electronic monitoring; requires tracking movement & location of each offender; requires timely reporting & recording of offender's presence in certain circumstances; requires that such records be available upon request; requires offender sentenced to lifetime electronic monitoring to wear or carry monitoring device as determined by FDLE; requires offender to reimburse FDLE for cost of monitoring; authorizes imprisonment for specified violations relating to monitoring to run consecutively with other violations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Lifetime Electronic Monitoring of Sex Offenders

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-28HouseDied in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2015-03-03HouseIntroduced
2015-01-15HouseReferred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2015-01-07HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S0134 (Same As) 2015-05-01 - Died in Criminal Justice
S1286 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
H1037 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died on Calendar

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
94371Amended CodeSee Bill Text
943711Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback