FL S0090 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 27 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-15 - On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 01/22/19, 12:30 pm, 301 Senate Building
Pending: Senate Children, Families, and Elder Affairs Committee
Hearing: Jan 22 @ 12:30 pm in 301 Senate Building
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing circuit courts to create early childhood court programs; providing requirements and guidelines for the Office of the State Courts Administrator when hiring community coordinators and a statewide training specialist; authorizing the office to provide funding to circuit courts that choose to establish a coordination system in lieu of creating a community coordinator position, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Early Childhood Courts

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-15SenateOn Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 01/22/19, 12:30 pm, 301 Senate Building
2018-12-13SenateReferred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
2018-11-27SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H139 (Same As) 2019-01-09 - Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Judiciary Committee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3901304Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback