FL S0082 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Special Master on Claim Bills
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Special Master on Claim Bills
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing for an appropriation to compensate Marcus Button for injuries sustained as a result of the negligence of an employee of the Pasco County School Board; providing for an appropriation to compensate Mark and Robin Button, as parents and natural guardians of Marcus Button, for injuries and damages sustained by Marcus Button; providing a limitation on the payment of fees and costs, etc.
Title
Relief of Mark, Robin, and Marcus Button by the Pasco County School Board
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | Senate | Died in Special Master on Claim Bills |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2014-12-03 | Senate | Referred to Special Master on Claim Bills; Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations |
2014-07-31 | Senate | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/82 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0082/BillText/Filed/HTML |