FL S0064 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on August 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-11-03 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Providing that driver license or identification card applications, driver license or identification card renewal applications, and changes of address for existing driver licenses or identification cards submitted to the department serve as voter registration applications; requiring the supervisor of elections to provide a notification of registration to each applicant; providing that an applicant is registered, or has his or her voter registration record updated, if he or she fails to respond to the notification within a specified timeframe, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Voter Registration

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-03SenateWithdrawn prior to introduction
2017-11-03SenateWithdrawn from Ethics and Elections; Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
2017-08-28SenateReferred to Ethics and Elections; Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
2017-08-09SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S704 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Ethics and Elections

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
97057Amended CodeSee Bill Text
98045Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback