FL S0704 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 31 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-01-09 - Introduced
Pending: Senate Ethics and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Providing that driver license or identification card applications, driver license or identification card renewal applications, and changes of address for existing driver licenses or identification cards submitted to the department serve as voter registration applications; requiring the supervisor of elections to provide a notification of registration to each applicant, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Voter Registration

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-11-08SenateReferred to Ethics and Elections; Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
2017-10-31SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S64 (Same As) 2017-11-03 - Withdrawn prior to introduction

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
97057Amended CodeSee Bill Text
98045Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback