FL S0062 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Citing this act as the "Dorothy L. Hukill Student Safety Act"; providing requirements for the use of physical restraint; providing requirements for the use of exclusionary and nonexclusionary time; providing requirements for documenting, reporting, and monitoring the use of restraint and exclusionary or nonexclusionary time; requiring continuing education and inservice training for instructional personnel in teaching students with emotional or behavioral disabilities, etc.
Title
Students with Disabilities in Public Schools
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-14 | Senate | CS by Education read 1st time |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2019-03-12 | Senate | CS by Education; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Education, 03/12/19, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Referred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations |
2018-11-20 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H349 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Education
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1003 | 573 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1012 | 582 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |