FL H0349 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-7-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-7-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits use of seclusion on students; revises provisions relating to use of restraint on certain students; provides DOE, school district, school, & personnel requirements; requires continuing education & inservice training for teaching students with emotional or behavioral disabilities.
Title
Students with Disabilities in Public Schools
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#92 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Education |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Received |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Referred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations |
2019-04-18 | Senate | In Messages |
2019-04-11 | House | CS passed; YEAS 115 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-11 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2019-04-10 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-04 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/10/19 |
2019-03-28 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-03-28 | House | Favorable by- Education Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-26 | House | On Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 03/28/19, 8:30 am, Reed Hall |
2019-03-20 | House | Now in Education Committee |
2019-03-20 | House | CS referred to Education Committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Original reference(s) removed: PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee |
2019-03-20 | House | CS by PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee read 1st time |
2019-03-19 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2019-03-19 | House | CS by PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-15 | House | PCS on Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee, 03/19/19, 3:30 pm, Reed Hall |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-01-30 | House | Referred to PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee; PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee |
2019-01-18 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S62 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1003 | 573 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1012 | 582 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |