FL S0052 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on August 1 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-21 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 6515
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Providing for the relief of Cathleen Smiley by Brevard County; providing for an appropriation to compensate Cathleen Smiley for personal injuries and damages sustained in an automobile accident caused by a Brevard County employee, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relief of Cathleen Smiley by Brevard County

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-21SenateLaid on Table, refer to CS/HB 6515
2018-02-21SenateSubstituted CS/HB 6515
2018-02-21SenateRead 2nd time
2018-02-19SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/21/18
2018-02-01SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-02-01SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2018-01-29SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/01/18, 11:30 am, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-01-24SenateNow in Rules
2018-01-23SenateFavorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2018-01-18SenateOn Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 01/23/18, 3:30 pm, 401 Senate Office Building
2018-01-12SenateNow in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
2018-01-11SenateCS by Judiciary read 1st time
2018-01-11SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-01-10SenateCS by Judiciary; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2018-01-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/10/18, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-01-05SenateNow in Judiciary
2018-01-04SenateRecommendation: Favorable with 1 amendment(s) by Special Master on Claim Bills
2017-08-28SenateReferred to Special Master on Claim Bills; Judiciary; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2017-08-01SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H6515 (Same As) 2018-02-21 - Placed on 3rd reading

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback