FL S0048 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on August 1 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Introduced
Pending: Senate Special Master On Claim Bills Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Providing for the relief of Marcus Button by the Pasco County School Board; providing an appropriation to compensate Marcus Button for injuries sustained as a result of the negligence of an employee of the Pasco County School Board; providing an appropriation to compensate Mark and Robin Button, as parents and natural guardians of Marcus Button, for injuries and damages sustained by Marcus Button, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relief of Marcus Button by the Pasco County School Board

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2018-12-13SenateReferred to Special Master on Claim Bills; Judiciary; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2018-08-01SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H6531 (Same As) 2019-03-25 - CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback