FL H6531 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides appropriation to compensate Marcus Button for injuries sustained as result of negligence of employee of Pasco County School Board; provides appropriation to compensate Mark & Robin Button, as parents & natural guardians of Marcus Button, for injuries & damages sustained by Marcus Button; provides limitation on payment of attorney fees, lobbying fees, & costs or other similar expenses.
Title
Relief/Marcus Button/Pasco County School Board
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Died on Calendar |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-04-03 | House | Favorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-01 | House | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 04/03/19, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2019-03-27 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee read 1st time |
2019-03-26 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2019-03-25 | House | CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-21 | House | On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 03/25/19, 3:00 pm, Sumner Hall |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2019-03-11 | House | Introduced |
2019-03-11 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S48 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Special Master on Claim Bills
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
148 | 95 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
215 | 29 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
368 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
472 | 85 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
558 | 31 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
768 | 28 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |