FL S0030 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Special Master on Claim Bills
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Special Master on Claim Bills
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing for the relief of Barney Brown, who was wrongfully incarcerated for 38 years; providing an appropriation to compensate him for his wrongful incarceration; providing that the act does not waive certain defenses or increase the state's liability; providing that the appropriation satisfies all present and future claims related to the wrongful incarceration, etc.
Title
Relief of Barney Brown by the State of Florida
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Special Master on Claim Bills |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-08-28 | Senate | Referred to Special Master on Claim Bills; Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2017-08-01 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H6503 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/30 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/30/BillText/Filed/HTML |