FL H6503 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides appropriation from State of Florida to compensate Barney Brown for wrongful incarceration; provides that act does not waive certain defenses or increase state's liability; provides limitation on payment of compensation, fees, & costs.
Title
Relief/Barney Brown/State of Florida
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | House | Died in Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee |
2018-03-10 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2017-08-30 | House | Referred to Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Judiciary Committee |
2017-08-22 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S30 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Special Master on Claim Bills
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/6503 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/6503/BillText/Filed/PDF |