FL S0020 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 24 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-08 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 3517 (Ch. 2016-268)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on July 24 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-08 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 3517 (Ch. 2016-268)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Providing for the relief of Rafael Zaldivar and Kyoko Zaldivar, parents of Alex Zaldivar, deceased, individually and as co-personal representatives of the Estate of Alex Zaldivar, and Brienna Campos and Remington Campos by Orange County; providing for an appropriation to compensate Rafael Zaldivar and Kyoko Zaldivar for the death of Alex Zaldivar and to compensate Brienna Campos and Remington Campos for the injuries and damages they sustained as a result of the negligence of Orange County; providing a limitation on the payment of fees and costs, etc.
Title
Relief of Zaldivar and Campos by Orange County
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-08 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 3517 (Ch. 2016-268) |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Substituted CS/HB 3517 |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/08/16 |
2016-03-01 | Senate | CS by Fiscal Policy read 1st time |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2016-02-24 | Senate | CS by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-19 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 02/24/16, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Now in Fiscal Policy |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-11 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/16/16, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Office Building |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Now in Community Affairs |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-04 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/09/16, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Recommendation: Unfavorable by Special Master on Claim Bills |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-08-19 | Senate | Referred to Special Master on Claim Bills; Judiciary; Community Affairs; Fiscal Policy |
2015-07-24 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H3517 (Same As) 2016-04-15 - Chapter No. 2016-268