FL H3517 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-15 - Chapter No. 2016-268
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-15 - Chapter No. 2016-268
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for appropriation to compensate Estate of Alex Zaldivar for his death, & Brienna Campos & Remington Campos for their injuries & damages sustained as result of negligence by Orange County; provides limitation on payment of fees & costs.
Title
Relief/Alex Zaldivar, Brienna Campos, & Remington Campos/Orange County
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#2 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#640 (Y: 106 N: 10 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#640 (Y: 106 N: 10 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-15 | Chapter No. 2016-268 | |
2016-03-25 | Approved by Governor | |
2016-03-11 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2016-03-09 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2016-03-09 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 20 |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Withdrawn from Rules |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Received |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2016-02-24 | Senate | In Messages |
2016-02-24 | House | CS passed; YEAS 106 NAYS 10 |
2016-02-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-02-23 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2016-02-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-02-19 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/23/16 |
2016-02-03 | House | Referred to- Calendar |
2016-02-03 | House | Original reference(s) removed: Judiciary Committee |
2016-02-02 | House | CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee read 1st time |
2016-02-02 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2016-02-01 | House | CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 2 |
2016-01-28 | House | On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 02/01/16, 3:00 pm, Sumner Hall |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced |
2015-12-10 | House | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2015-11-19 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0020 (Same As) 2016-03-08 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 3517 (Ch. 2016-268)