FL S0016 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Providing for the relief of Christeia Jones, as the natural parent and legal guardian of Logan Grant, Denard Maybin, Jr., and Lanard Maybin; providing an appropriation to compensate them for injuries and damages sustained as a result of the negligence of Trooper Raul Umana and the Florida Highway Patrol, a division of the Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles; providing a limitation on the payment of attorney fees, etc.
Title
Relief of Christeia Jones, Logan Grant, Denard Maybin, Jr., and Lanard Maybin/Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Appropriations |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-02-26 | Senate | CS by Judiciary read 1st time |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 5 NAYS 1 |
2020-02-21 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 02/25/20, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2020-02-19 | Senate | CS by Judiciary; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-14 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/19/20, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2020-02-06 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/11/20, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Building --Not Considered |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Report Submitted by Special Master on Claim Bills |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-08-16 | Senate | Referred to Special Master on Claim Bills; Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations |
2019-08-01 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H6517 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Committee