FL S0004 | 2015 | 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 33-A (Ch. 2015-221)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Reducing the tax rate applied to the sale of communications services; reducing the tax rate applied to the retail sale of direct-to-home satellite services; authorizing dealers to use a period other than a calendar month for the purpose of determining the communications services taxes to be remitted; revising the distributions of tax revenue received from the sales and use tax, communications services tax, and gross receipts tax, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Taxes

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-19SenateDied in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 33-A (Ch. 2015-221)
2015-06-08SenateReferred to Appropriations
2015-06-01SenateIntroduced
2015-06-01SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H0033 (Similar To) 2015-06-18 - Chapter No. 2015-221

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20212Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20212001Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20218Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20227Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20228Amended CodeSee Bill Text
203001Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21220Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback