FL H0033 | 2015 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-18 - Chapter No. 2015-221
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Reducing the tax rates applied to the sale of communications services and the retail sale of direct-to-home satellite services; exempting from the sales and use tax admissions to and membership fees for gun clubs; revising eligibility requirements for certain research and development tax credits for certain business enterprises; providing an exemption from the sales and use tax for the retail sale of certain clothes, school supplies, and personal computers and personal computer-related accessories during a specified period, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Taxation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#427 (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 27 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#2 (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#416 (Y: 97 N: 10 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#412 (Y: 29 N: 71 NV: 20 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-18 Chapter No. 2015-221
2015-06-16 Approved by Governor
2015-06-15 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2015-06-15HouseOrdered engrossed, then enrolled
2015-06-15HousePassed as amended; YEAS 91 NAYS 2
2015-06-15HouseConcurred in 1 amendment(s) (807672)
2015-06-15HouseWas taken up
2015-06-15HouseIn returning messages
2015-06-15SenatePassed as amended; YEAS 34 NAYS 2
2015-06-15SenateRead 3rd time
2015-06-12SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2015-06-12SenateAmendment(s) adopted (807672)
2015-06-12SenateRead 2nd time
2015-06-11SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 06/12/15
2015-06-11SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2015-06-11SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Amendments)
2015-06-11SenateFavorable with 1 amendment(s) by- Appropriations (252976); YEAS 14 NAYS 1
2015-06-09SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 06/11/15, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2015-06-08SenateReceived
2015-06-08SenateReferred to Appropriations
2015-06-05SenateIn Messages
2015-06-05HousePassed as amended; YEAS 97 NAYS 10
2015-06-05HouseRead 3rd time
2015-06-04HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2015-06-04HouseAmendment(s) failed (664773)
2015-06-04HouseAmendment(s) adopted (412735)
2015-06-04HouseRead 2nd time
2015-06-03HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 06/04/15
2015-06-02HouseIntroduced
2015-06-02HouseReferred to Calendar
2015-06-02HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S0004 (Similar To) 2015-06-19 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 33-A (Ch. 2015-221)
S0006 (Similar To) 2015-06-19 - Died in Appropriations

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1930235Amended CodeSee Bill Text
196161Amended CodeSee Bill Text
196173Amended CodeSee Bill Text
196202Amended CodeSee Bill Text
19801Amended CodeSee Bill Text
198015Amended CodeSee Bill Text
19802Amended CodeSee Bill Text
198021Amended CodeSee Bill Text
19803Amended CodeSee Bill Text
198031Amended CodeSee Bill Text
19804Amended CodeSee Bill Text
19805Amended CodeSee Bill Text
19806Amended CodeSee Bill Text
19807Amended CodeSee Bill Text
19808Amended CodeSee Bill Text
19811Amended CodeSee Bill Text
19813Amended CodeSee Bill Text
19814Amended CodeSee Bill Text
19815Amended CodeSee Bill Text
198155Amended CodeSee Bill Text
19816Amended CodeSee Bill Text
19817Amended CodeSee Bill Text
19818Amended CodeSee Bill Text
19819Amended CodeSee Bill Text
19820Amended CodeSee Bill Text
19821Amended CodeSee Bill Text
19822Amended CodeSee Bill Text
19823Amended CodeSee Bill Text
19824Amended CodeSee Bill Text
19825Amended CodeSee Bill Text
19826Amended CodeSee Bill Text
19828Amended CodeSee Bill Text
19829Amended CodeSee Bill Text
19830Amended CodeSee Bill Text
19831Amended CodeSee Bill Text
19832Amended CodeSee Bill Text
19833Amended CodeSee Bill Text
19834Amended CodeSee Bill Text
19835Amended CodeSee Bill Text
19836Amended CodeSee Bill Text
19837Amended CodeSee Bill Text
19838Amended CodeSee Bill Text
19839Amended CodeSee Bill Text
19840Amended CodeSee Bill Text
19841Amended CodeSee Bill Text
19842Amended CodeSee Bill Text
19844Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20212Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20212001Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20218Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20227Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20228Amended CodeSee Bill Text
203001Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2069825Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21202Amended CodeSee Bill Text
212031Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21204Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21205Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21208Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21220Amended CodeSee Bill Text
213015Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21305Amended CodeSee Bill Text
213053Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21321Amended CodeSee Bill Text
213285Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21526Amended CodeSee Bill Text
22002Amended CodeSee Bill Text
22003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
220183Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2201845Amended CodeSee Bill Text
220196Amended CodeSee Bill Text
37630781Amended CodeSee Bill Text
377809Amended CodeSee Bill Text
56406Amended CodeSee Bill Text
624509Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6245105Amended CodeSee Bill Text
72011Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7337011Amended CodeSee Bill Text
95091Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015A/33A
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015A/0033A/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015A/0033A/BillText/e1/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015A/0033A/BillText/e2/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015A/0033A/BillText/er/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015A/0033A/Amendment/244919/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015A/0033A/Amendment/262391/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015A/0033A/Amendment/412735/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015A/0033A/Amendment/664773/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015A/0033A/Amendment/670385/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015A/0033A/Amendment/146113/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015A/0033A/Amendment/949193/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015A/0033A/Amendment/848557/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015A/0033A/Amendment/496616/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015A/0033A/Amendment/153900/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015A/0033A/Amendment/252976/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015A/0033A/Amendment/807672/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015A/0033A/Amendment/526436/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015A/0033A/Amendment/397090/HTML
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015A/0033A/Vote/HouseVote_h0033A__412.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015A/0033A/Vote/HouseVote_h0033Ae1416.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015A/0033A/Vote/SenateVote_h0033Ae1002.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015A/0033A/Vote/HouseVote_h0033Ae1427.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback