FL S0002 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Citing this act as the "Florida Excellence in Higher Education Act of 2017"; revising requirements for the performance-based metrics used to award Florida College System institutions with performance-based incentives; revising the Distinguished Florida College System Institution Program excellence standards requirements; requiring certain performance-based metrics to include specified graduation rates and access benchmarks; requiring each Florida Community College System institution to execute at least one "2+2" Targeted Pathway articulation agreement by a specified time, etc.
Title
Higher Education
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#2 (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | House | Died in Messages |
2017-05-05 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-15 | House | In Messages |
2017-03-09 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 35 NAYS 1 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Ordered engrossed |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (433696, 869454) |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Amendment(s) failed (231668, 424158, 440968, 692246, 891426, 934886) |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-07 | Senate | CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2017-03-07 | Senate | CS by Education read 1st time |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/08/17 |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2017-02-23 | Senate | CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/23/17, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Higher Education; YEAS 5 NAYS 1 |
2017-01-30 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Higher Education, 02/08/17, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Higher Education |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2017-01-23 | Senate | CS by Education; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2017-01-13 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Education, 01/23/17, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Higher Education; Appropriations |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0374 (Similar To) 2017-06-14 - Vetoed by Governor
H0489 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Post-Secondary Education Subcommittee
H0003 (Same As) 2017-05-05 - Died in Appropriations Committee
H0929 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Education Committee
S4 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Appropriations
H5 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Post-Secondary Education Subcommittee
H155 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Post-Secondary Education Subcommittee
S1296 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Education
S1464 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Education
H0489 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Post-Secondary Education Subcommittee
H0003 (Same As) 2017-05-05 - Died in Appropriations Committee
H0929 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Education Committee
S4 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Appropriations
H5 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Post-Secondary Education Subcommittee
H155 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Post-Secondary Education Subcommittee
S1296 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Education
S1464 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Education
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1001 | 66 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1001 | 67 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1001 | 706 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1001 | 7065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1001 | 92 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1004 | 6497 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1004 | 6498 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1007 | 23 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1007 | 27 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1008 | 30 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1009 | 22 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1009 | 23 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1009 | 24 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1009 | 53 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1009 | 534 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1009 | 701 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1009 | 89 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1009 | 893 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1009 | 894 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1009 | 98 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1013 | 79 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
267 | 062 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |