FL H0005 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Post-Secondary Education Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Post-Secondary Education Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires state universities to use gap analyses to identify internship opportunities in high-demand fields; establishes World Class Faculty & Scholar Program; authorizes investments in certain faculty retention, recruitment & recognition activities; establishes State University Professional & Graduate Degree Excellence Program; specifies requirements for quality improvement efforts to elevate prominence of certain state university degree programs; revises provisions relating to Alec P. Courtelis University Facility Enhancement Challenge Grant Program.
Title
Faculty Recruitment
Sponsors
Sen. Bryan Avila [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | House | Died in Post-Secondary Education Subcommittee |
2017-05-05 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-02-02 | House | Referred to Post-Secondary Education Subcommittee; Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee |
2017-01-27 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0004 (Same As) 2017-05-05 - Died in Appropriations
S2 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Messages
H3 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Appropriations Committee
S374 (Similar To) 2017-06-14 - Vetoed by Governor
S2 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Messages
H3 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Appropriations Committee
S374 (Similar To) 2017-06-14 - Vetoed by Governor
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1001 | 706 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1004 | 6497 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1004 | 6498 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1013 | 79 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
267 | 062 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/5 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/0005/BillText/Filed/PDF |