FL H0003 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to public postsecondary performance-based incentives, Distinguished Florida College System Institution Program, Board of Governors of the State University System, preeminent state research universities program, articulated acceleration mechanisms, postsecondary common placement testing, block tuition, & specified scholarship & grant programs; creates World Class Faculty & Scholar Program & 2+2 targeted pathway articulation agreements.
Title
Higher Education
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | House | Died in Appropriations Committee |
2017-05-05 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-04-07 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2017-04-07 | House | CS referred to Appropriations Committee; Education Committee |
2017-04-07 | House | Original reference(s) removed: Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee |
2017-03-21 | House | CS by Post-Secondary Education Subcommittee read 1st time |
2017-03-21 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2017-03-20 | House | CS by Post-Secondary Education Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 3 |
2017-03-16 | House | On Committee agenda-- Post-Secondary Education Subcommittee, 03/20/17, 3:30 pm, Mashburn Hall |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-02-02 | House | Referred to Post-Secondary Education Subcommittee; Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee |
2017-01-27 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0002 (Same As) 2017-05-05 - Died in Messages
H0489 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Post-Secondary Education Subcommittee
S0374 (Similar To) 2017-06-14 - Vetoed by Governor
H0929 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Education Committee
S1296 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Education
S4 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Appropriations
H5 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Post-Secondary Education Subcommittee
H0489 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Post-Secondary Education Subcommittee
S0374 (Similar To) 2017-06-14 - Vetoed by Governor
H0929 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Education Committee
S1296 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Education
S4 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Appropriations
H5 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Post-Secondary Education Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1001 | 66 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1001 | 67 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1001 | 706 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1001 | 7065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1001 | 92 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1004 | 6497 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1007 | 23 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1007 | 27 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1008 | 30 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1008 | 39 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1009 | 22 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1009 | 23 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1009 | 24 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1009 | 53 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1009 | 531 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1009 | 534 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1009 | 701 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1009 | 89 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1009 | 893 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |