FL S0002 | 2015 | 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-05 - CS failed to pass; YEAS 41 NAYS 72
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Creating the Florida Health Insurance Affordability Exchange Program (FHIX) within the Agency for Health Care Administration; providing patient rights and responsibilities; providing for the development of a long-term reorganization plan and the formation of the FHIX Workgroup; providing for the establishment of a commission; revising the scope of the Florida Health Choices Program and the pricing of services under the program; limiting eligible persons in the Medically Needy program to those under the age of 21 and pregnant women, and specifying an effective date, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health Insurance Affordability Exchange

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#415 (Y: 41 N: 72 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-06-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#414 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#411 (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#2 (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-05HouseCS failed to pass; YEAS 41 NAYS 72
2015-06-05HouseAmendment(s) adopted (352815)
2015-06-05HouseRead 3rd time
2015-06-04HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2015-06-04HouseRead 2nd time
2015-06-03HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 06/04/15
2015-06-03HouseReceived
2015-06-03HouseReferred to Calendar
2015-06-03HouseIn Messages
2015-06-03SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 33 NAYS 3
2015-06-03SenateRead 3rd time
2015-06-03SenateAmendment(s) failed (187734)
2015-06-03SenateAmendment(s) adopted (121532, 144308, 619710, 851446, 945482)
2015-06-03SenateRead 2nd time
2015-06-03SenateCS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
2015-06-03SenateCS by Health Policy read 1st time
2015-06-02SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 06/03/15
2015-06-02SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2015-06-02SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2015-06-02SenateCS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2015-06-01SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 06/02/15, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2015-06-01SenateNow in Appropriations
2015-06-01SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2015-06-01SenateCS by Health Policy; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2015-06-01SenateOn Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 06/01/15, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2015-06-01SenateReferred to Health Policy; Appropriations
2015-06-01SenateIntroduced
2015-05-26SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S2508 (Similar To) 2015-06-23 - Chapter No. 2015-225, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500-A (Ch. 2015-232)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
40870Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408910Amended CodeSee Bill Text
40972Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409720Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409721Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409722Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409723Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409724Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409725Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409726Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409727Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409728Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409729Amended CodeSee Bill Text
40973Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409730Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409731Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409904Amended CodeSee Bill Text
62491Amended CodeSee Bill Text
624915Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015A/2A
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015A/0002A/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015A/0002A/BillText/c1/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015A/0002A/BillText/c2/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015A/0002A/BillText/e1/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015A/0002A/Amendment/260258/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015A/0002A/Amendment/968888/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015A/0002A/Amendment/852368/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015A/0002A/Amendment/945482/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015A/0002A/Amendment/121532/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015A/0002A/Amendment/619710/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015A/0002A/Amendment/851446/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015A/0002A/Amendment/144308/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015A/0002A/Amendment/187734/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015A/0002A/Amendment/585949/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015A/0002A/Amendment/352815/PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015A/0002A/Vote/SenateVote_s0002Ac2002.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015A/0002A/Vote/HouseVote_s0002Ae1411.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015A/0002A/Vote/HouseVote_s0002Ae1414.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015A/0002A/Vote/HouseVote_s0002Ae1415.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback