FL S2508 | 2015 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-23 - Chapter No. 2015-225, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500-A (Ch. 2015-232)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing the Agency for Health Care Administration to receive intergovernmental transfers of funds from governmental entities for specified purposes; requiring the Agency for Health Care Administration to provide written notice, pursuant to ch. 120, F.S., of reimbursement rates to providers; revising the annual allocation cap for hospitals participating in the Statewide Medicaid Residency Program; requiring that certain achieved savings rebates be placed in the General Revenue Fund, unallocated, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medicaid

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-19 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#432 (Y: 81 N: 32 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#3 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#399 (Y: 80 N: 26 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#6 (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-23 Chapter No. 2015-225, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500-A (Ch. 2015-232)
2015-06-23 Approved by Governor
2015-06-19 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2015-06-19SenateOrdered engrossed, then enrolled
2015-06-19HousePassed as amended by Conference Committee Report; YEAS 81 NAYS 32
2015-06-19HouseConference Committee Report adopted (145994)
2015-06-19HouseConference Committee Report considered
2015-06-19HouseIn returning messages
2015-06-19SenatePassed as amended by Conference Committee Report; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
2015-06-19SenateConference Committee Report adopted (145994)
2015-06-19SenateConference Committee Report received
2015-06-05SenateConference Committee appointed: Appropriations Conference Committee: Lee (Chair), Benacquisto (Vice Chair), Flores (At Large), Galvano (At Large), Grimsley (At Large), Joyner (At Large), Margolis (At Large), Richter (At Large), Simmons (At Large), Smith (At Large); Appropriations Conference Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice/Justice: Negron (Chair), Bradley, Evers, Flores, Hutson, Joyner; Appropriations Conference Committee on Education/Education: Gaetz (Chair), Bullard, Galvano, Legg, Montford, Simmons, Stargel; Appropriations Conference Committee on General Government/Government Operations: Hays (Chair), Altman, Braynon, Dean, Margolis, Simpson; Appropriations Conference Committee on Health and Human Services/Health Care: Garcia (Chair), Bean, Benacquisto, Grimsley, Richter, Smith, Sobel; Appropriations Conference Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development/Transportation and Economic Development: Latvala (Chair), Brandes, Clemens, Detert, Diaz de la Portilla, Gibson, Hukill, Sachs, Thompson
2015-06-05HouseConference Committee appointed: Representatives Corcoran (Chair), Boyd (Vice Chair), Hudson (Chair), Brodeur, Cummings, Fant, Harrell, Magar, Pigman, Renner, Stevenson, Berman, Cruz, Murphy, Richardson, Albritton (At Large), Caldwell (At Large), Diaz, J. (At Large), Eisnaugle (At Large), Fresen (At Large), Gaetz (At Large), Goodson (At Large), Ingram (At Large), McBurney (At Large), Metz (At Large), Nunez (At Large), Oliva (At Large), O'Toole (At Large), Porter (At Large), Raschein (At Large), Wood (At Large), Young (At Large), Clarke-Reed (At Large), Jones, M. (At Large), Pafford (At Large), Rouson (At Large), Stafford (At Large), Williams (At Large)
2015-06-04SenateIn returning messages
2015-06-04HouseRefused to pass the Senate bill as passed by the Senate and acceded to the request for conference
2015-06-04HousePassed as amended; YEAS 80 NAYS 26
2015-06-04HouseRead 3rd time
2015-06-04HouseAmendment(s) adopted (297529)
2015-06-04HouseRead 2nd time
2015-06-03HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 06/04/15
2015-06-03HouseReceived
2015-06-03HouseReferred to Calendar
2015-06-01HouseIn Messages
2015-06-01SenateThe Senate requests that the House pass the bill as passed by the Senate or agree to include the bill in the Budget Conference
2015-06-01SenatePassed; YEAS 31 NAYS 4
2015-06-01SenateRead 3rd time
2015-06-01SenateRead 2nd time
2015-06-01SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2015-06-01SenateWithdrawn from Appropriations
2015-06-01SenateReferred to Appropriations
2015-06-01SenateIntroduced
2015-05-22SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S2500 (Similar To) 2015-08-18 - Line Item Veto Message referred to Rules
S0002 (Similar To) 2015-06-05 - CS failed to pass; YEAS 41 NAYS 72
H0009 (Similar To) 2015-06-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500-A (Ch. 2015-232), SB 2508-A (Ch. 2015-225)
H0001 (Similar To) 2015-06-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500-A (Ch. 2015-232), SB 2502-A (Ch. 2015-222), SB 2504-A (Ch. 2015-223), SB 2506-A (Ch. 2015-224), SB 2508-A (Ch. 2015-225), SB 2510-A (Ch. 2015-226), SB 2512-A (Ch. 2015-227), SB 2514-A (Ch. 2015-228), SB 2516-A (Ch. 2015-229), SB 2520-A (Ch. 2015-230), SB 2522-A (Ch. 2015-231)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
38318Amended CodeSee Bill Text
395602Amended CodeSee Bill Text
40807Amended CodeSee Bill Text
40870Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408910Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409720Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409721Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409722Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409723Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409724Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409725Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409726Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409727Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409728Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409729Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409730Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409731Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4098132Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409904Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409905Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409908Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4099082Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409909Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409911Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409967Amended CodeSee Bill Text
40997Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409975Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409983Amended CodeSee Bill Text
430707Amended CodeSee Bill Text
62491Amended CodeSee Bill Text
624915Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback