FL H9361 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-14 - See HB 5001 (line item 1253A)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-14 - See HB 5001 (line item 1253A)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Liberty County Sheriff's Office Administrative and Jail Complex.
Title
Liberty County Sheriff's Office Administrative and Jail Complex
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Shoaf [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-25 - House - House Justice Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | See HB 5001 (line item 1253A) |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-25 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2022-01-25 | House | Reported out of Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-01-25 | House | Favorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-01-21 | House | Added to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee Consent Agenda |
2022-01-12 | House | Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-01-08 | House | Filed |