FL H8035 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-13 - Adopted by Publication
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-13 - Adopted by Publication
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes April 13, 2023, as "NASCAR Day" in Florida.
Title
NASCAR Day
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Leek [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-13 | House | Adopted by Publication |
2023-04-13 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-13 | House | Placed on Ceremonial Resolutions Calendar - Publication only |
2023-04-12 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-04-11 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/8035 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/8035/BillText/Filed/PDF |