FL H8011 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-15 - Adopted by Publication
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-15 - Adopted by Publication
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes March 8, 2021, as "International Women's Day" in Florida.
Title
International Women's Day
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-15 | House | Adopted by Publication |
2021-04-15 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-15 | House | Placed on Ceremonial Resolutions Calendar - Publication only |
2021-03-16 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-03-15 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/8011 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/8011/BillText/Filed/PDF |