FL H8003 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Adopted by Publication
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Commemorates 175th anniversary of Marion County & recognizes March 25, 2019, as "Marion County Day" in Florida.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Marion County Day

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-20HouseAdopted by Publication
2019-03-20HouseRead 2nd time
2019-03-20HousePlaced on Ceremonial Resolutions Calendar - Publication only
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-02-13HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S678 (Similar To) 2019-03-14 - Adopted

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback