FL H8003 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on October 26 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-07 - Adopted by Publication
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Designates week of April 8-15, 2018, as "Days of Remembrance" & April 12, 2018, as "Holocaust Remembrance Day" in Florida.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Holocaust Remembrance Day and Week

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-07HouseAdopted by Publication
2018-02-07HouseRead 2nd time
2018-02-07HousePlaced on Ceremonial Resolutions Calendar - Publication only
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2017-10-26HouseFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback