FL H7165 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-07 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-43
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-07 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-43
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Removes scheduled repeal under Open Government Sunset Review Act of exemption from public records requirements for specified identifying information in records created by domestic violence fatality review team & exemption from public meetings requirements for specified meetings of domestic violence fatality review team.
Title
OGSR/Domestic Violence Fatality Review Teams [SPSC]
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-23 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0007 - Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-19 - House - House Roll Call No. 0803 - Passage (Y: 108 N: 5 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-19 - House - House Roll Call No. 0803 - Passage (Y: 108 N: 5 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-07 | Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-43 | |
2010-04-30 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor -HJ 01700 | |
2010-04-26 | Ordered enrolled | |
2010-04-23 | Read 3rd time -SJ 00760; CS passed; YEAS 34 NAYS 0 -SJ 00760 | |
2010-04-22 | Withdrawn from Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability -SJ 00746; Substituted for SB 884 -SJ 00746; Read 2nd time -SJ 00746 | |
2010-04-21 | Received -SJ 00718 | |
2010-04-20 | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability -SJ 00718 | |
2010-04-19 | In Messages | |
2010-04-19 | Read 3rd time -HJ 00740; CS passed; YEAS 108 NAYS 5 -HJ 00740 | |
2010-04-15 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00692 | |
2010-04-12 | Placed on Calendar -HJ 00662 | |
2010-04-08 | CS read 1st time on 04/08/10 -HJ 00646; Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.20 | |
2010-04-07 | CS by- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 -HJ 00649 | |
2010-04-05 | On Council agenda-- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council, 04/07/10, 8:00 am, 404-H | |
2010-03-22 | Referred to Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00358 | |
2010-03-19 | Filed; Introduced -HJ 00347 |
Same As/Similar To
S0884 (Same As) 2010-04-22 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00746; Substituted CS/HB 7165 -SJ 00746; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7165 (Ch. 2010-43) -SJ 00746