FL H7155 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-25 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1842 (Ch. 2013-101), CS/SB 648 (Ch. 2013-174)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-25 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1842 (Ch. 2013-101), CS/SB 648 (Ch. 2013-174)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for applicability of Florida Insurance Code & rules with respect to Patient Protection & Affordable Care Act (PPACA); authorizes OIR to review forms & perform market conduct examinations for compliance with PPACA & to report potential violations to United States DOH & Human Services; authorizes Division of Consumer Services of DFS to respond to complaints related to PPACA & to report violations to office & United States DOH & Human Services; provides that certain determinations by office or DFS related to compliance with PPACA are not decisions that affect party's substantial interests for purposes of ch. 120, F.S.; conforms provisions to changes made by this act with respect to registration of navigators under Florida Insurance Code; provides directive to Division of Law Revision & Information; provides scope of part XII, ch. 626, F.S.; requires registration of navigators with DFS; provides purpose for such registration; provides qualifications for registration; provides for submission of written application; specifies fees; requires applicant to submit fingerprints & pay processing. APPROPRIATION:
Title
Health Insurance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-25 | House | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1842 (Ch. 2013-101), CS/SB 648 (Ch. 2013-174) |
2013-04-25 | House | Substituted CS/SB 1842 |
2013-04-23 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/25/13 |
2013-04-23 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-04-22 | House | CS by Regulatory Affairs Committee read 1st time |
2013-04-22 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) |
2013-04-16 | House | CS by- Regulatory Affairs Committee; YEAS 13 NAYS 4 |
2013-04-12 | House | On Committee agenda-- Regulatory Affairs Committee, 04/16/13, 9:00 am, 404 HOB |
2013-04-05 | House | Referred to Regulatory Affairs Committee |
2013-04-03 | House | Introduced |
2013-04-03 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1842 (Similar To) 2013-06-03 - Chapter No. 2013-101, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 648 (Ch. 2013-174)
H0635 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in returning Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 157 (Ch. 2013-190), CS/HB 1191 (Ch. 2013-209), CS/CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2013-160), SB 356 (Ch. 2013-125), CS/CS/SB 468 (Ch. 2013-66), CS/SB 1842 (Ch. 2013-101)
S1046 (Similar To) 2013-04-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 157 (Ch. 2013-190), CS/HB 1191 (Ch. 2013-209), CS/CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2013-160), SB 356 (Ch. 2013-125), CS/CS/SB 468 (Ch. 2013-66), CS/SB 1842 (Ch. 2013-101)
S0648 (Similar To) 2013-06-17 - Chapter No. 2013-174, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1842 (Ch. 2013-101)
H0635 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in returning Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 157 (Ch. 2013-190), CS/HB 1191 (Ch. 2013-209), CS/CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2013-160), SB 356 (Ch. 2013-125), CS/CS/SB 468 (Ch. 2013-66), CS/SB 1842 (Ch. 2013-101)
S1046 (Similar To) 2013-04-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 157 (Ch. 2013-190), CS/HB 1191 (Ch. 2013-209), CS/CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2013-160), SB 356 (Ch. 2013-125), CS/CS/SB 468 (Ch. 2013-66), CS/SB 1842 (Ch. 2013-101)
S0648 (Similar To) 2013-06-17 - Chapter No. 2013-174, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1842 (Ch. 2013-101)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
624 | 25 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
624 | 26 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
624 | 34 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 995 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 9951 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 9952 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 9953 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 9954 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 9955 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 9956 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 9957 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 9958 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 402 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 410 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 411 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 642 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 6425 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 648 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 6482 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 6484 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 6486 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 64872 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 6488 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 6489 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 649 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 6492 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 6494 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 6496 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 6498 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 6499 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 657 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 6571 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 6675 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 6699 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
641 | 31 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
641 | 3922 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |