FL H7117 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Povidies honorary designations of various transportation facilities in specified counties; provides for erection of markers.
Title
Transportation Facility Designations
Sponsors
House Economic Affairs Committee | House Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee | Rep. Holly Raschein [R] | Sen. Daphne Campbell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | House | Died on Calendar |
2013-04-30 | House | Retained on Calendar |
2013-04-29 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/30/13 |
2013-04-12 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-04-11 | House | CS by Economic Affairs Committee read 1st time |
2013-04-11 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) |
2013-04-09 | House | CS by- Economic Affairs Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-05 | House | On Committee agenda-- Economic Affairs Committee, 04/09/13, 2:30 pm, Reed Hall |
2013-03-28 | House | Referred to Economic Affairs Committee |
2013-03-25 | House | Introduced |
2013-03-25 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0300 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died on Calendar