FL H7115 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-30 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1808 (Ch. 2013-71)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-30 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1808 (Ch. 2013-71)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes DEP to implement specified provisions to control nutrient load in state waters & implement specified nutrient standards; provides for deletion of specified rule from Florida Administrative Code; provides that specified numeric nutrient rules are subject to certain rule provisions & exempt from ratification by Legislature; directs department to establish certain numeric interpretations of the narrative nutrient criterion for certain estuaries & submit a specified report.
Title
Numeric Nutrient Criteria
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-30 | House | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1808 (Ch. 2013-71) |
2013-04-30 | House | Substituted CS/SB 1808 |
2013-04-29 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/30/13 |
2013-04-03 | House | Referred to- Calendar |
2013-04-03 | House | Original reference(s) removed: Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2013-04-02 | House | CS by Rulemaking Oversight and Repeal Subcommittee read 1st time |
2013-04-02 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2013-04-01 | House | CS by Rulemaking Oversight and Repeal Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-28 | House | On Committee agenda-- Rulemaking Oversight and Repeal Subcommittee, 04/01/13, 4:00 pm, 306 HOB |
2013-03-28 | House | Referred to Rulemaking Oversight and Repeal Subcommittee; Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2013-03-25 | House | Introduced |
2013-03-25 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1808 (Same As) 2013-05-30 - Chapter No. 2013-71
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
120 | 541 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 061 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |