FL H7063 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-09 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Substituted SB 1784; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 1784 (Ch. 2010-5) -HJ 00229
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-09 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Substituted SB 1784; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 1784 (Ch. 2010-5) -HJ 00229
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Deletes provisions that have expired, have become obsolete, have had their effect, have served their purpose, or have been impliedly repealed or superseded; replaces incorrect cross-references & citations; corrects grammatical, typographical, & like errors; removes inconsistencies, redundancies, & unnecessary repetition in statutes; improves clarity of statutes & facilitates their correct interpretation, etc.
Title
Florida Statutes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-09 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Substituted SB 1784; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 1784 (Ch. 2010-5) -HJ 00229 | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Calendar -HJ 00152 | |
2010-03-01 | Referred to Calendar | |
2010-02-23 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1784 (Similar To) 2010-03-30 - Approved by Governor -SJ 00575; Chapter No. 2010-5
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0007 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0011 | 45 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0017 | 0315 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0028 | 39 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0034 | 205 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0039 | 4086 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0112 | 354 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0112 | 361 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0112 | 363 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0120 | 52 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0120 | 55 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0121 | 053 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0121 | 081 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0121 | 091 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0163 | 31771 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0163 | 3180 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0175 | 071 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0185 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0192 | 001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0192 | 0105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0193 | 1555 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0193 | 503 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0193 | 703 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0196 | 011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0196 | 075 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0196 | 1975 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0196 | 1977 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0197 | 402 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0200 | 069 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0210 | 1801 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0211 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0212 | 098 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0215 | 211 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0238 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0238 | 071 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0238 | 09 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0255 | 043 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0260 | 019 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0265 | 2865 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0265 | 32 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0265 | 606 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0265 | 701 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0282 | 201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0282 | 204 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0282 | 318 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0282 | 5001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0282 | 5002 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0282 | 5003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0282 | 5004 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0282 | 5005 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0282 | 5006 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0282 | 5007 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0282 | 5008 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0282 | 702 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0288 | 012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0288 | 021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0288 | 0656 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0288 | 1081 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0288 | 1169 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0288 | 1224 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0311 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0311 | 121 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0311 | 122 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0318 | 18 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0318 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0321 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0322 | 181 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0322 | 271 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0327 | 73 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0334 | 044 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0337 | 0261 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0337 | 16 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0338 | 235 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0365 | 172 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0373 | 046 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0373 | 236 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0376 | 30713 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0377 | 709 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0380 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0381 | 84 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0381 | 912 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0382 | 357 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0394 | 875 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0394 | 9082 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0395 | 4036 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0397 | 311 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0397 | 334 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0400 | 141 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0400 | 195 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0400 | 474 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0403 | 0872 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0403 | 93345 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0403 | 9336 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0408 | 0361 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0408 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0408 | 820 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0409 | 816 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0409 | 905 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0409 | 908 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0409 | 911 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0409 | 912 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0409 | 91211 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0420 | 628 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0430 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0440 | 105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0443 | 1117 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0445 | 049 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0450 | 231 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0456 | 041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0466 | 0067 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0472 | 016 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0472 | 036 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0473 | 315 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0489 | 119 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0494 | 00321 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0494 | 00611 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0494 | 0066 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0501 | 1377 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0517 | 191 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0526 | 144 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0556 | 105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0569 | 19 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0576 | 092 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0589 | 011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0624 | 91 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0627 | 062 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0627 | 351 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0733 | 817 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0817 | 36 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0921 | 002 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0934 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 335 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 57 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1004 | 87 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1011 | 71 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1011 | 73 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1013 | 45 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |