FL H7051 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-21 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 7008 (Ch. 2015-71)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-21 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 7008 (Ch. 2015-71)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Saves from repeal public meetings exemption for portions of meetings of Board of Funeral, Cemetery, & Consumer Services within DFS at which licensure examination questions or answers are discussed & public records exemption for recording of closed portion of meeting of board; removes scheduled repeal of exemptions.
Title
OGSR/Board of Funeral, Cemetery, & Consumer Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-21 | House | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 7008 (Ch. 2015-71) |
2015-04-21 | House | Substituted SB 7008 |
2015-04-17 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/21/15 |
2015-03-19 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-03-19 | House | Favorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-17 | House | On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 03/19/15, 12:30 pm, Morris Hall |
2015-03-10 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2015-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2015-03-05 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S7008 (Same As) 2015-05-22 - Chapter No. 2015-71
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/7051 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/7051/BillText/Filed/PDF |