FL S7008 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-22 - Chapter No. 2015-71
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amending provisions relating to an exemption from public meeting requirements for portions of meetings of the Board of Funeral, Cemetery, and Consumer Services within the Department of Financial Services at which licensure examination questions or answers are discussed; saving the exemption from repeal under the Open Government Sunset Review Act, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

OGSR/Licensure Examination Questions/Board of Funeral, Cemetery, and Consumer Services

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#229 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#8 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-22 Chapter No. 2015-71
2015-05-21 Approved by Governor
2015-05-07 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2015-04-22SenateOrdered enrolled
2015-04-22HousePassed; YEAS 116 NAYS 0
2015-04-22HouseRead 3rd time
2015-04-21HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2015-04-21HouseRead 2nd time
2015-04-21HouseSubstituted for HB 7051
2015-04-17HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/21/15
2015-04-17HouseReceived
2015-04-17HouseReferred to Calendar
2015-04-01HouseIn Messages
2015-03-24SenatePassed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
2015-03-24SenateRead 3rd time
2015-03-18SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2015-03-18SenateRead 2nd time
2015-03-12SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/18/15
2015-03-12SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2015-03-12SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2015-03-09SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/12/15, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building
2015-03-04SenateNow in Rules
2015-03-04SenateFavorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 4 NAYS 0
2015-03-03SenateIntroduced
2015-02-27SenateOn Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/04/15, 1:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building
2015-02-06SenateReferred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2015-02-04SenateFiled
2015-01-26SenateOn Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 02/03/15, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building -- Submitted as Committee Bill; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2015-01-26SenateSubmitted for consideration by Banking and Insurance

Same As/Similar To

H7051 (Same As) 2015-04-21 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 7008 (Ch. 2015-71)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
497172Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback