FL H7029 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-09 - Chapter No. 2022-181
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-09 - Chapter No. 2022-181
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes court to order child on supervised release detention care to comply with specified conditions; authorizes court to place child on supervised release detention care for any time period; provides exception; specifies time period for which court may order child to be held in secure detention care; authorizes extension of secure detention; requires specified findings; requires hearing to determine continued need for secure detention.
Title
Time Limitations for Preadjudicatory Juvenile Detention Care
Sponsors
House Judiciary Committee | House Criminal Justice and Public Safety Subcommittee | Rep. Chuck Brannan [R] | Rep. Melony Bell [R] |
Rep. Kevin Chambliss [D] | Rep. Sam Garrison [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#3 (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#660 (Y: 77 N: 37 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Judiciary Committee (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Judiciary Committee (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House Justice Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#660 (Y: 77 N: 37 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Judiciary Committee (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Judiciary Committee (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House Justice Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-09 | Chapter No. 2022-181 | |
2022-06-08 | Approved by Governor | |
2022-06-06 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2022-03-07 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2022-03-07 | House | In Messages |
2022-03-07 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 27 NAYS 10 699 |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Amendment(s) failed (469898, 849842) |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 7040 |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Withdrawn from Appropriations |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Received |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2022-03-02 | Senate | In Messages |
2022-03-02 | House | CS passed; YEAS 77, NAYS 37 |
2022-03-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-01 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2022-03-01 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2022-03-01 | House | Amendment 045323 Failed |
2022-03-01 | House | Amendment 184053 Failed |
2022-03-01 | House | Amendment 854019 Failed |
2022-03-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-24 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2022-02-24 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/1/2022) |
2022-02-24 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2022-02-24 | House | CS Filed |
2022-02-24 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2022-02-23 | House | Reported out of Judiciary Committee |
2022-02-23 | House | Favorable with CS by Judiciary Committee |
2022-02-21 | House | Added to Judiciary Committee agenda |
2022-02-03 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2022-02-03 | House | Reported out of Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-02-03 | House | Favorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-02-01 | House | Added to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee agenda |
2022-01-28 | House | Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-01-26 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-01-26 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S7040 (Similar To) 2022-03-04 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 7029
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
985 | 24 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 26 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |