FL H6525 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides appropriation from DCF to compensate C.M.H. for injuries & damages sustained as result of negligence of DCF; requires certain funds to be placed in irrevocable trust; provides limitation on fees & costs.
Title
Relief/C.M.H./Department of Children and Families
Sponsors
House Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee | House Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee | Rep. James Grant [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#243 (Y: 112 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Died in Appropriations |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Received |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2017-04-26 | Senate | In Messages |
2017-04-26 | House | CS passed; YEAS 112 NAYS 4 |
2017-04-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-25 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2017-04-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-20 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/25/17 |
2017-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-04-13 | House | Favorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 1 |
2017-04-11 | House | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 04/13/17, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2017-04-07 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2017-04-05 | House | CS/CS by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time |
2017-04-04 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2017-04-04 | House | CS/CS by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-31 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 04/04/17, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2017-03-17 | House | Now in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2017-03-14 | House | CS by Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee read 1st time |
2017-03-14 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2017-03-13 | House | CS by Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 1 |
2017-03-09 | House | On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee, 03/13/17, 1:30 pm, Sumner Hall |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-03-01 | House | Referred to Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2017-02-17 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0034 (Same As) 2017-05-05 - Died in Appropriations