FL S0034 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Providing for the relief of C.M.H.; providing an appropriation to compensate C.M.H. for injuries and damages sustained as a result of the negligence of the Department of Children and Families, formerly known as the Department of Children and Family Services; requiring certain funds to be placed into an irrevocable trust, etc.
Title
Relief of C.M.H. by the Department of Children and Families
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Died in Appropriations |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-13 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 04/18/17, 4:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services |
2017-03-15 | Senate | CS by Judiciary read 1st time |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2017-03-14 | Senate | CS by Judiciary; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 03/14/17, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Recommendation: Favorable by Special Master on Claim Bills |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2016-12-08 | Senate | Referred to Special Master on Claim Bills; Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2016-08-01 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H6525 (Same As) 2017-05-05 - Died in Appropriations