FL H6523 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - Chapter No. 2018-191
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - Chapter No. 2018-191
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides appropriation from Palm Beach County School Board to compensate Ashraf Kamel & Marguerite Dimitri for wrongful death of child Jean A. Pierre Kamel as result of negligence of school board; provides limitation on payment of fees & costs.
Title
Relief/Ashraf Kamel & Marguerite Dimitri/Palm Beach County School Board
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#29 (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#730 (Y: 112 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#730 (Y: 112 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-09 | Chapter No. 2018-191 | |
2018-03-23 | Approved by Governor | |
2018-03-21 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2018-03-08 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2018-03-08 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 34 NAYS 1 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Substituted for SB 48 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Withdrawn from Judiciary; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Received |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2018-03-01 | Senate | In Messages |
2018-03-01 | House | CS passed; YEAS 112 NAYS 3 |
2018-03-01 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2018-02-28 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-22 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/28/18 |
2018-02-07 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-07 | House | Favorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2018-02-05 | House | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 02/07/18, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2018-01-31 | House | CS by Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee read 1st time |
2018-01-31 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2018-01-30 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2018-01-30 | House | CS by Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-26 | House | On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee, 01/30/18, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2017-11-15 | House | Referred to Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2017-11-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S48 (Same As) 2018-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 6523
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
768 | 28 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
935 | 66 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |