FL S0048 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on August 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 6523
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on August 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 6523
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing for the relief of Ashraf Kamel and Marguerite Dimitri by the Palm Beach County School Board; providing for an appropriation to compensate Ashraf Kamel and Marguerite Dimitri for the wrongful death of their minor child, Jean A. Pierre Kamel, as a result of the negligence of the Palm Beach County School Board, etc.
Title
Relief of Ashraf Kamel and Marguerite Dimitri by the Palm Beach County School Board
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-07 | Senate | Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 6523 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Substituted CS/HB 6523 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time 838 |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/07/18 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 12 NAYS 1 |
2018-02-19 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/22/18, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 02/13/18, 10:00 am, 401 Senate Office Building |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-12 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/18/18, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Recommendation: Favorable by Special Master on Claim Bills |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-08-28 | Senate | Referred to Special Master on Claim Bills; Judiciary; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2017-08-01 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H6523 (Same As) 2018-04-09 - Chapter No. 2018-191
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/48 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/48/BillText/Filed/HTML |