FL H6105 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Public Integrity & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Public Integrity & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals provisions relating to civil actions challenging validity of election laws, prohibition on use of private funds for election-related expenses, and certain criminal penalties; revises provisions relating to voter registration, third-party voter registration organizations, address changes, solicitation of voters, vote-by-mail ballot requests, vote-by-mail ballots, secure drop boxes, & penalties.
Title
Elections
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Public Integrity & Elections Committee |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-12 | House | Now in Public Integrity & Elections Committee |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Public Integrity & Elections Committee |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-01-05 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1722 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Ethics and Elections
H1353 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Public Integrity & Elections Committee
S1914 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Ethics and Elections
H1353 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Public Integrity & Elections Committee
S1914 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Ethics and Elections
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
101 | 051 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 62 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 64 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 69 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
102 | 031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
104 | 0616 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
97 | 029 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
97 | 0291 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
97 | 0575 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
97 | 1031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/6105 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/6105/BillText/Filed/PDF |