FL S1914 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Ethics and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Ethics and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the Secretary of State to be elected rather than appointed; requiring applicants registering to vote to designate a party affiliation or affirmatively select "No Party Affiliation"; providing that a person who meets certain requirements may register to vote at an early voting site or at his or her polling place and immediately thereafter cast a ballot; requiring the Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles to provide the opportunity to preregister to vote to certain individuals; removing a requirement that a third-party voter registration organization provide certain notice to an applicant; establishing General Election Day as a paid holiday, etc.
Title
Elections
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in Ethics and Elections |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Ethics and Elections; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1353 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Public Integrity & Elections Committee
H6105 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Public Integrity & Elections Committee
S368 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Ethics and Elections
S524 (Similar To) 2022-04-26 - Chapter No. 2022-73
S1722 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Ethics and Elections
H6105 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Public Integrity & Elections Committee
S368 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Ethics and Elections
S524 (Similar To) 2022-04-26 - Chapter No. 2022-73
S1722 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Ethics and Elections
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
100 | 371 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
100 | 51 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 016 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 048 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 151 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 5612 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 62 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 64 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 65 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 68 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 6952 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 71 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
102 | 031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
102 | 111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
102 | 112 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
102 | 181 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
97 | 053 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
97 | 0556 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
97 | 057 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
97 | 0575 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
98 | 045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
98 | 065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
99 | 061 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1914 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1914/BillText/Filed/HTML |