FL S1722 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Ethics and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Ethics and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repealing a provision relating to civil actions challenging the validity of election laws; revising the time period within which a third-party voter registration organization must deliver voter registration applications to the Division of Elections of the Department of State or to a supervisor of elections; revising information that an elector must provide to a supervisor of elections when the elector changes his or her residence address; revising requirements for vote-by-mail ballot requests, etc.
Title
Elections
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in Ethics and Elections |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Ethics and Elections; Judiciary; Appropriations |
2022-01-07 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H6105 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Public Integrity & Elections Committee
H1353 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Public Integrity & Elections Committee
S1914 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Ethics and Elections
H1353 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Public Integrity & Elections Committee
S1914 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Ethics and Elections
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
101 | 051 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 62 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 64 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 69 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
102 | 031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
104 | 0616 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
97 | 029 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
97 | 0291 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
97 | 0575 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
97 | 1031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1722 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1722/BillText/Filed/HTML |