FL H5711 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Conference Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5001 (Ch. 2010-152)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides for consolidation of joint legislative functions & assessment & reassignment of duties of joint legislative organizations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Joint Legislative Organizations [WPSC]

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-04-06 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0028 - Passage (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-30 Died in Conference Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5001 (Ch. 2010-152)
2010-04-19 Conference Committee appointed: Rivera, Flores, Bullard, Clarke-Reed, Coley, Fresen, Kiar, Legg, Stargel, Proctor, Brise, Burgin, Jones, McKeel, O'Toole, Reed, Glorioso, Gibson, Jenne, Horner, Hukill, Murzin, Rogers, Schenck, Adams, Eisnaugle, Holder, Kreegel, Porth, Rouson, Soto, Tobia, Hays, Abruzzo, Braynon, Gonzalez, Nelson, Ray, Workman, Williams, A., Grimsley, Chestnut, Ford, Frishe, Hudson, Roberson, Y., Skidmore, Thompson, N., Poppell, Bembry, Boyd, Brandenburg, Crisafulli, Plakon, Precourt, Williams, T., Bogdanoff, Aubuchon, Bernard, Carroll, Dorworth, Patronis, Fitzgerald, Thurston, Galvano, Gibbons, Hasner, Lopez-Cantera, Reagan, Sands, Thompson, G., Weatherford, McBurney -HJ 00735
2010-04-16 Conference Committee appointed: Senators Alexander, Chair; Haridopolos, Vice Chair; Altman, Bennett, Justice, Ring, Storms, At Large; Criminal & Civil Justice: Crist, Chair; Jones, Joyner, Villalobos, Wilson; Education Pre-K-12: Wise, Chair; Bullard, Detert, Garcia, Richter, Siplin; General Government: Baker, Chair; Aronberg, Dean, Lawson, Oelrich; Health & Human Services: Peaden, Chair; Gaetz, Haridopolos, Negron, Rich, Sobel; Higher Education: Lynn, Chair; Constantine, Gelber, Thrasher; Trans & Econ Development: Fasano, Chair; Diaz de la Portilla, Dockery, Gardiner, Hill, Smith -SJ 00648
2010-04-06 In returning messages
2010-04-06 Withdrawn from Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00423; Placed on Special Order Calendar -SJ 00423; Read 2nd time -SJ 00508; Amendment(s) adopted (147150) -SJ 00508; Adopted as amended (147150); YEAS 34 NAYS 5 -SJ 00508; Immediately certified -SJ 00508; Refused to concur, acceded to the request of the House for conference -SJ 00509
2010-04-05 Received -SJ 00419; Referred to Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00419
2010-04-01 In Messages
2010-04-01 Immediately certified -HJ 00470; Requests Senate adopt the Concurrent Resolution as adopted by House or agree to conference -HJ 00470
2010-03-31 Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00438; Adopted -HJ 00438
2010-03-23 Filed; Introduced -HJ 00371; Referred to Calendar -HJ 00371

Same As/Similar To

H5709 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Conference Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5001 (Ch. 2010-152), CS/CS/SB 1412 (Ch. 2010-102)
H5001 (Similar To) 2010-07-19 - Line Item Veto Message received -HJ 00012; Line Item Veto Message referred to Rules and Calendar Council -HJ 00016
S2700 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Senate, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5001 (Ch. 2010-152), HB 5003 (Ch. 2010-153), CS/HB 5101 (Ch. 2010-154), HB 5201 (Ch. 2010-155), HB 5301 (Ch. 2010-156), HB 5303 (Ch. 2010-157), HB 5305 (Ch. 2010-158), HB 5307 (Ch. 2010-159), HB 5309 (Ch. 2010-160), HB 5311 (Ch. 2010-161), CS/HB 5401 (Ch. 2010-162), HB 5501 (Ch. 2010-163), HB 5505 (Ch. 2010-164), HB 5705 (Ch. 2010-165), CS/HB 5801 (Ch. 2010-166)

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback