FL S2700 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Senate, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5001 (Ch. 2010-152), HB 5003 (Ch. 2010-153), CS/HB 5101 (Ch. 2010-154), HB 5201 (Ch. 2010-155), HB 5301 (Ch. 2010-156), HB 5303 (Ch. 2010-157), HB 5305 (Ch. 2010-158), HB 5307 (Ch. 2010-159), HB 5309 (Ch. 2010-160), HB 5311 (Ch. 2010-161), CS/HB 5401 (Ch. 2010-162), HB 5501 (Ch. 2010-163), HB 5505 (Ch. 2010-164), HB 5705 (Ch. 2010-165), CS/HB 5801 (Ch. 2010-166)

Summary

Provides moneys for the annual period beginning July 1, 2010, and ending June 30, 2011, to pay salaries, and other expenses, capital outlay - buildings, and other improvements, and for other specified purposes of the various agencies of state government. APPROPRIATION: $68,629,480,943.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriations

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2010-03-31 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0004 - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-31 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0002 - Amendment (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-30 Died in Senate, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5001 (Ch. 2010-152), HB 5003 (Ch. 2010-153), CS/HB 5101 (Ch. 2010-154), HB 5201 (Ch. 2010-155), HB 5301 (Ch. 2010-156), HB 5303 (Ch. 2010-157), HB 5305 (Ch. 2010-158), HB 5307 (Ch. 2010-159), HB 5309 (Ch. 2010-160), HB 5311 (Ch. 2010-161), CS/HB 5401 (Ch. 2010-162), HB 5501 (Ch. 2010-163), HB 5505 (Ch. 2010-164), HB 5705 (Ch. 2010-165), CS/HB 5801 (Ch. 2010-166)
2010-03-31 Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00373; Amendment(s) adopted (995102, 995101, 995100, 995099, 995098, 995097, 995096, 995095, 995094, 995071, 995068, 995066, 995065, 995063, 995062, 995061, 995059, 995058, 995057, 995056, 995055, 995053, 995051) -SJ 00373; Read 3rd time -SJ 00382; Passed as amended (995102, 995101, 995100, 995099, 995098, 995097, 995096, 995095, 995094, 995071, 995068, 995066, 995065, 995063, 995062, 995061, 995059, 995058, 995057, 995056, 995055, 995053, 995051); YEAS 37 NAYS 0 -SJ 00382
2010-03-30 Introduced -SJ 00351
2010-03-26 SPB 7090 submitted as a committee bill (SB 2700) by Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means; Filed; Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 00351

Same As/Similar To

H5003 (Similar To) 2010-07-19 - Line Item Veto Message received -HJ 00016; Line Item Veto Message referred to Rules and Calendar Council -HJ 00016
H5201 (Similar To) 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-155; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5001 (Ch. 2010-152)
H5301 (Similar To) 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-156; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5001 (Ch. 2010-152)
H5303 (Similar To) 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-157; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5001 (Ch. 2010-152)
H5305 (Similar To) 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-158; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5001 (Ch. 2010-152)
H5307 (Similar To) 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-159; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5001 (Ch. 2010-152)
H5309 (Similar To) 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-160; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5001 (Ch. 2010-152)
H5311 (Similar To) 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-161; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5001 (Ch. 2010-152)
H5401 (Similar To) 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-162; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5001 (Ch. 2010-152), CS/HB 7069 (Ch. 2010-114)
H5403 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Conference Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5001 (Ch. 2010-152), CS/HB 5401 (Ch. 2010-162)
H5501 (Similar To) 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-163; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 325 (Ch. 2010-80), HB 5001 (Ch. 2010-152)
H5503 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Conference Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5001 (Ch. 2010-152), HB 5003 (Ch. 2010-153)
H5505 (Similar To) 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-164; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5001 (Ch. 2010-152)
H5601 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Conference Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5001 (Ch. 2010-152)
H5603 (Similar To) 2010-07-19 - Veto Message received -HJ 00011; Veto Message referred to Rules and Calendar Council -HJ 00016
H5605 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Conference Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5001 (Ch. 2010-152)
H5607 (Similar To) 2010-07-19 - Veto Message received -HJ 00011; Veto Message referred to Rules and Calendar Council -HJ 00016
H5611 (Similar To) 2010-07-19 - Veto Message received -HJ 00011; Veto Message referred to Rules and Calendar Council -HJ 00016
H5701 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Conference Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5001 (Ch. 2010-152)
H5703 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Conference Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5001 (Ch. 2010-152)
H5705 (Similar To) 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-165; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5001 (Ch. 2010-152)
H5707 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Conference Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5001 (Ch. 2010-152)
H5709 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Conference Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5001 (Ch. 2010-152), CS/CS/SB 1412 (Ch. 2010-102)
H5711 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Conference Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5001 (Ch. 2010-152)
H5713 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Conference Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5001 (Ch. 2010-152)
H5801 (Similar To) 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-166; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5001 (Ch. 2010-152), HB 5003 (Ch. 2010-153), CS/HB 7157 (Ch. 2010-138)
S1390 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5001 (Ch. 2010-152), HB 5003 (Ch. 2010-153)
S1416 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5001 (Ch. 2010-152), HB 5003 (Ch. 2010-153)
S1440 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5001 (Ch. 2010-152), HB 5003 (Ch. 2010-153)
S1470 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5001 (Ch. 2010-152), HB 5003 (Ch. 2010-153)
S2384 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Senate, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5001 (Ch. 2010-152), HB 5705 (Ch. 2010-165)
S2798 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5001 (Ch. 2010-152), HB 5003 (Ch. 2010-153)
S2800 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5001 (Ch. 2010-152), HB 5003 (Ch. 2010-153)
S2802 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5001 (Ch. 2010-152), HB 5003 (Ch. 2010-153)
S2804 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5001 (Ch. 2010-152), HB 5003 (Ch. 2010-153)
S2806 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5001 (Ch. 2010-152), HB 5003 (Ch. 2010-153)
S2808 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5001 (Ch. 2010-152), HB 5003 (Ch. 2010-153)
H5001 (Similar To) 2010-07-19 - Line Item Veto Message received -HJ 00012; Line Item Veto Message referred to Rules and Calendar Council -HJ 00016
H5101 (Similar To) 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-154; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5001 (Ch. 2010-152), SJR 2 (Passed)
S1368 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Senate, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5001 (Ch. 2010-152), CS/HB 5101 (Ch. 2010-154), SJR 2 (Passed)
S2702 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Senate, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5001 (Ch. 2010-152), HB 5003 (Ch. 2010-153)
S1400 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Senate, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5001 (Ch. 2010-152), CS/HB 5401 (Ch. 2010-162), CS/HB 7069 (Ch. 2010-114)

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback