FL H5603 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-19 - Veto Message received -HJ 00011; Veto Message referred to Rules and Calendar Council -HJ 00016
Pending: House Rules & Calendar Council Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Revises duties of Division of Consumer Services; revises criteria for premiums charged to agencies & departments for purposes of State Risk Management Trust Fund; revises reporting requirements on state insurance program; requires Division of Risk Management to analyze & report on certain agency return-to-work programs & activities; requires certain agencies to establish & maintain return-to-work programs for certain employees, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of Financial Services [WPSC]

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-04-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0067 - Conference Committee Report (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-30 - House - House Roll Call No. 1114 - Passage (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-06 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0016 - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-01 - House - House Roll Call No. 0657 - Passage (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-07-19 Veto Message received -HJ 00011; Veto Message referred to Rules and Calendar Council -HJ 00016
2010-05-28 Vetoed by Governor, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5001 (Ch. 2010-152)
2010-05-13 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2010-04-30 Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -HJ 01695
2010-04-30 In returning messages; Conference Committee Report received -SJ 01551; Conference Committee Report adopted -SJ 01553; Passed as amended by Conference Committee Report (856731); YEAS 38 NAYS 0 -SJ 01553
2010-04-30 Conference Committee Report received -HJ 01407; Conference Committee Report adopted -HJ 01407; Passed as amended by Conference Committee Report; YEAS 120 NAYS 0 -HJ 01409
2010-04-19 Conference Committee appointed: Rivera, Flores, Bullard, Clarke-Reed, Coley, Fresen, Kiar, Legg, Stargel, Proctor, Brise, Burgin, Jones, McKeel, O'Toole, Reed, Glorioso, Gibson, Jenne, Horner, Hukill, Murzin, Rogers, Schenck, Adams, Eisnaugle, Holder, Kreegel, Porth, Rouson, Soto, Tobia, Hays, Abruzzo, Braynon, Gonzalez, Nelson, Ray, Workman, Williams, A., Grimsley, Chestnut, Ford, Frishe, Hudson, Roberson, Y., Skidmore, Thompson, N., Poppell, Bembry, Boyd, Brandenburg, Crisafulli, Plakon, Precourt, Williams, T., Bogdanoff, Aubuchon, Bernard, Carroll, Dorworth, Patronis, Fitzgerald, Thurston, Galvano, Gibbons, Hasner, Lopez-Cantera, Reagan, Sands, Thompson, G., Weatherford, McBurney -HJ 00735
2010-04-16 Conference Committee appointed: Senators Alexander, Chair; Haridopolos, Vice Chair; Altman, Bennett, Justice, Ring, Storms, At Large; Criminal & Civil Justice: Crist, Chair; Jones, Joyner, Villalobos, Wilson; Education Pre-K-12: Wise, Chair; Bullard, Detert, Garcia, Richter, Siplin; General Government: Baker, Chair; Aronberg, Dean, Lawson, Oelrich; Health & Human Services: Peaden, Chair; Gaetz, Haridopolos, Negron, Rich, Sobel; Higher Education: Lynn, Chair; Constantine, Gelber, Thrasher; Trans & Econ Development: Fasano, Chair; Diaz de la Portilla, Dockery, Gardiner, Hill, Smith -SJ 00648
2010-04-06 In returning messages
2010-04-06 Withdrawn from Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00423; Placed on Special Order Calendar -SJ 00423; Read 2nd time -SJ 00503; Amendment(s) adopted (192930) -SJ 00503; Read 3rd time -SJ 00503; Passed as amended (192930); YEAS 38 NAYS 0 -SJ 00503; Immediately certified -SJ 00503; Refused to concur, acceded to the request of the House for conference -SJ 00509
2010-04-05 Received -SJ 00417; Referred to Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00417
2010-04-01 In Messages
2010-04-01 Read 3rd time -HJ 00463; Passed; YEAS 116 NAYS 1 -HJ 00463; Immediately certified -HJ 00470; Requests the Senate pass the bill as passed by the House or agree to conference -HJ 00470
2010-03-31 Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00436
2010-03-23 Favorable by- Full Appropriations Council on Education & Economic Development; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 -HJ 00381; Placed on Calendar -HJ 00381
2010-03-19 On Council agenda-- Full Appropriations Council on Education & Economic Development, 03/23/10, 11:15 am, Webster Hall
2010-03-18 Referred to Full Appropriations Council on Education & Economic Development -HJ 00340
2010-03-17 Filed; Introduced -HJ 00308

Same As/Similar To

S1512 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means
H5001 (Similar To) 2010-07-19 - Line Item Veto Message received -HJ 00012; Line Item Veto Message referred to Rules and Calendar Council -HJ 00016
S2700 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Senate, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5001 (Ch. 2010-152), HB 5003 (Ch. 2010-153), CS/HB 5101 (Ch. 2010-154), HB 5201 (Ch. 2010-155), HB 5301 (Ch. 2010-156), HB 5303 (Ch. 2010-157), HB 5305 (Ch. 2010-158), HB 5307 (Ch. 2010-159), HB 5309 (Ch. 2010-160), HB 5311 (Ch. 2010-161), CS/HB 5401 (Ch. 2010-162), HB 5501 (Ch. 2010-163), HB 5505 (Ch. 2010-164), HB 5705 (Ch. 2010-165), CS/HB 5801 (Ch. 2010-166)
H1219 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC), companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 2086 (Ch. 2010-127)
S2724 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Banking and Insurance, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 2086 (Ch. 2010-127)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
001704Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0020121Amended CodeSee Bill Text
028401Amended CodeSee Bill Text
028436Amended CodeSee Bill Text
028442Amended CodeSee Bill Text
028450Amended CodeSee Bill Text
044013Amended CodeSee Bill Text
044050Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/index.cfm?Mode=Bills&SubMenu=1&Tab=session&BI_Mode=ViewBillInfo&BillNum=5603&Chamber=House&Year=2010
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=hb560300.html&Directory=session/2010/House/bills/billtext/html/
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=hb560301e1.html&Directory=session/2010/House/bills/billtext/html/
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=session/2010/House/bills/votes/html/hHB56030401100657.html
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=session/2010/House/bills/votes/html/SHB56030406100016.html
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=session/2010/House/bills/votes/html/hHB56030430101114.html
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=session/2010/House/bills/votes/html/SHB56030430100067.html

Bill Comments

feedback